IA HSB553 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2316
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2308
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2308
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2316.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2316.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing an alternative to filing a bond as a condition of registering and titling certain motor vehicles.(See HF 2316.)
Title
A bill for an act providing an alternative to filing a bond as a condition of registering and titling certain motor vehicles.(See HF 2316.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2316. |
2024-01-31 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 176. |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2024 11:30AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2024-01-10 | House | Subcommittee: Meggers, Wilson and Wulf. H.J. 73. |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 70. |
2024-01-10 | House | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3035 (Related) 2024-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2308.
HF2316 (Replaced by) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
SF2308 (Replaced by) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. S.J. 597.
HF2316 (Replaced by) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
SF2308 (Replaced by) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. S.J. 597.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB553 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB553.html |