IA HSB535 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2196
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2162
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2162
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to texting or using a mobile telephone while operating a commercial motor vehicle, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act relating to texting or using a mobile telephone while operating a commercial motor vehicle, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2018 8:00AM House Lounge |
2018-01-17 | House | Subcommittee: Worthan, Bacon and Forbes. H.J. 109. |
2018-01-17 | House | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
HF2196 (Replaced by) 2018-03-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 652.
SF2162 (Replaced by) 2018-03-14 - Withdrawn. S.J. 683.
SSB3049 (Related) 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2162 (Replaced by) 2018-03-14 - Withdrawn. S.J. 683.
SSB3049 (Related) 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB535 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB535.html |