IA HSB533 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2345
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2338
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2338
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2345.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2345.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to department of transportation employees designated as peace officers, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 2345.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to department of transportation employees designated as peace officers, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 2345.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2345. |
2022-02-09 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 247. |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2022 12:30PM RM 304.1. |
2022-01-28 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2022 12:30PM RM 304 (Cancelled). |
2022-01-11 | House | Subcommittee: Worthan, Dunwell and Hansen. H.J. 53. |
2022-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 50. |
2022-01-11 | House | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3059 (Related) 2022-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2338.
HF2345 (Replaced by) 2022-05-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 901.
SF2338 (Replaced by) 2022-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 819.
HF2345 (Replaced by) 2022-05-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 901.
SF2338 (Replaced by) 2022-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 819.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB533 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB533.html |