IA HSB528 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2335
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill relating to methods of notice and document delivery under the Iowa trust code, and including applicability provisions.
Title
A study bill relating to methods of notice and document delivery under the Iowa trust code, and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | House | Voted - Judiciary. |
2016-01-27 | House | 11:30AM; House Lounge Judiciary. |
2016-01-20 | House | Judiciary: Gustafson Chair,Jones, and Prichard. |
2016-01-20 | House | In Judiciary |
2016-01-20 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HF2335 (Replaced by) 2016-04-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 641.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB528 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB528.html |