IA HSB524 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to qualifications to receive a medical cannabidiol registration card.
Title
A bill for an act relating to qualifications to receive a medical cannabidiol registration card.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2024 8:00AM RM 304. |
2024-01-09 | House | Subcommittee: Thompson, P., Fry and Levin. H.J. 51. |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 46. |
2024-01-09 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3020 (Related) 2024-01-10 - Subcommittee: Taylor, J., Quirmbach, and Webster.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB524 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB524.html |