IA HSB522 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2163
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2158
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2158
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2163.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2163.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to public safety telecommunicators.(See HF 2163.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to public safety telecommunicators.(See HF 2163.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2163. |
2024-01-24 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 135. |
2024-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-10 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/16/2024 12:00PM RM 304. |
2024-01-09 | House | Subcommittee: Fisher, Kressig and Vondran. H.J. 50. |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 46. |
2024-01-09 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3030 (Related) 2024-01-30 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2158.
HF2163 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 926.
SF2158 (Replaced by) 2024-03-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 552.
HF2163 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 926.
SF2158 (Replaced by) 2024-03-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 552.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB522 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB522.html |