IA HSB521 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-11 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-11 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the qualifications of veterans.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the qualifications of veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-10 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/11/2024 12:00PM RM 304.1. |
2024-01-09 | House | Subcommittee: Graber, Brown-Powers and Hora. H.J. 50. |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs. H.J. 46. |
2024-01-09 | House | By COMMITTEE ON VETERANS AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3127 (Related) 2024-01-30 - Subcommittee: Reichman, Dotzler, and Salmon.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB521 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB521.html |