IA HSB511 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 1-0.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 1-0.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to civil procedure, including disclosures that may be made to a jury and the availability of certain medical records.
Title
A bill for an act relating to civil procedure, including disclosures that may be made to a jury and the availability of certain medical records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 1-0. |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2024 12:00PM RM 19. |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2024 12:00PM RM 19 (Cancelled). |
2024-01-09 | House | Subcommittee: Gustoff, Olson and Thomson, C. H.J. 50. |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 45. |
2024-01-09 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3011 (Related) 2024-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB511 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB511.html |