IA HSB510 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2190
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2172
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2172
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-29 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2190.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-29 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2190.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the issuance of a search warrant.(See HF 2190.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the issuance of a search warrant.(See HF 2190.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2190. |
2024-01-25 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 144. |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2024 7:30AM House Lounge. |
2024-01-09 | House | Subcommittee: Wills, J., Thomson, C. and Wilburn. H.J. 50. |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 45. |
2024-01-09 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3010 (Related) 2024-01-30 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2172.
HF2190 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 926.
SF2172 (Replaced by) 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 574.
HF2190 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 926.
SF2172 (Replaced by) 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 574.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB510 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB510.html |