IA HSB507 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2199
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the criminal offenses of the illegal use of a scanning device or encoding machine and criminal mischief in the third degree, and providing penalties.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the criminal offenses of the illegal use of a scanning device or encoding machine and criminal mischief in the third degree, and providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2018 12:45PM House Lounge |
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2018 9:00AM House Lounge (Cancelled) |
2018-01-10 | House | Subcommittee: Nunn, Hinson and R. Smith. H.J. 81. |
2018-01-10 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HF2199 (Replaced by) 2018-03-15 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 595.
SSB3024 (Related) 2018-01-17 - Subcommittee: Zaun, Schultz, and Kinney.
SSB3024 (Related) 2018-01-17 - Subcommittee: Zaun, Schultz, and Kinney.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB507 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB507.html |