IA HSB505 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2102
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2102.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2102.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to replacement of the term visitation with the term parenting time relative to time awarded to a parent.(See HF 2102.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to replacement of the term visitation with the term parenting time relative to time awarded to a parent.(See HF 2102.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-22 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2102. |
2024-01-18 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 112. |
2024-01-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-10 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/11/2024 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2024-01-09 | House | Subcommittee: Dunwell, Srinivas and Wheeler. H.J. 49. |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 44. |
2024-01-09 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HF2102 (Replaced by) 2024-01-22 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 116.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB505 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB505.html |