IA HSB50 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF343
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 343.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 343.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to state child care assistance eligibility for children of full-time child care providers.(See HF 343.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to state child care assistance eligibility for children of full-time child care providers.(See HF 343.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-20 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 343. |
2023-02-14 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 309. |
2023-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-02-07 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2023 8:00AM House Lounge 2. |
2023-01-17 | House | Subcommittee: Meyer, A., Fry and Matson. H.J. 119. |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 117. |
2023-01-17 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
HF343 (Replaced by) 2023-05-04 - Rereferred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 1029.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB50 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB50.html |