IA HSB44 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF197
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 197.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 197.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the approval procedures for claims for the military service property tax exemption and including applicability provisions.(See HF 197.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the approval procedures for claims for the military service property tax exemption and including applicability provisions.(See HF 197.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 197. |
2021-01-21 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 179. |
2021-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 179. |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/20/2021 1:00PM House Lounge. |
2021-01-13 | House | Subcommittee: Jeneary, Gjerde and McClintock. H.J. 89. |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs. H.J. 86. |
2021-01-13 | House | By COMMITTEE ON VETERANS AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
HF197 (Replaced by) 2021-02-02 - Subcommittee: Lofgren, Costello, and Dotzler. S.J. 222.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB44 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB44.html |