IA HSB36 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF364
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 364.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 364.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to prohibited conduct by athlete agents and making penalties applicable.(See HF 364.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to prohibited conduct by athlete agents and making penalties applicable.(See HF 364.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 364. |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 286. |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-01-14 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2021 1:30PM House Lounge. |
2021-01-13 | House | Subcommittee: Osmundson, Bohannan and Kaufmann. H.J. 88. |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 85. |
2021-01-13 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1039 (Related) 2021-01-19 - Subcommittee: Johnson, Boulton, and Reichman.
HF364 (Replaced by) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 868.
HF364 (Replaced by) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 868.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB36 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB36.html |