IA HSB3 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF397
Note: Legislation replaced by SF515
Note: Legislation replaced by SF515
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 397.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 397.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to electronic presence for purposes of executing wills and codicils.(See HF 397.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to electronic presence for purposes of executing wills and codicils.(See HF 397.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 397. |
2023-02-21 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 386. |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-01-25 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2023 12:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2023 12:00PM House Lounge (Cancelled). |
2023-01-11 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Gustoff, Collins and Wilburn. H.J. 73. |
2023-01-11 | House | Subcommittee: Gustoff, Collins and Meyer, B. H.J. 72. |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 71. |
2023-01-11 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1047 (Related) 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 515.
HF397 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1040.
SF515 (Replaced by) 2023-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 948.
HF397 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1040.
SF515 (Replaced by) 2023-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 948.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB3 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB3.html |