IA HSB272 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF608
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Subcommittee Meeting: 04/07/2021 8:00AM House Lounge 1 (Cancelled).
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Subcommittee Meeting: 04/07/2021 8:00AM House Lounge 1 (Cancelled).
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to tax collection and penalties, tax permits, and loans made by state-chartered banks.
Title
A bill for an act relating to tax collection and penalties, tax permits, and loans made by state-chartered banks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/07/2021 8:00AM House Lounge 1 (Cancelled). |
2021-03-30 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Bloomingdale and Gjerde. H.J. 871. |
2021-03-30 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 870. |
2021-03-30 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1268 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 608.
SF608 (Replaced by) 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1151.
SF608 (Replaced by) 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1151.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB272 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB272.html |