IA HSB26 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF487
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-23 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2019 8:00AM House Lounge.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-23 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2019 8:00AM House Lounge.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying the periods of time to bring criminal actions for sexual offenses against a minor, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act modifying the periods of time to bring criminal actions for sexual offenses against a minor, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2019 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee: Jones, Hite and Konfrst. H.J. 131. |
2019-01-22 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1054 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF487 (Replaced by) 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Petersen, and Schultz. S.J. 87.
SF487 (Replaced by) 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Petersen, and Schultz. S.J. 87.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB26 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB26.html |