IA HSB244 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to attribution statements on certain campaign signs and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act relating to attribution statements on certain campaign signs and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | House | Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation. |
2021-03-02 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/04/2021 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2021-02-24 | House | Subcommittee: Sexton, Hunter and Meyer, A.. H.J. 549. |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 547. |
2021-02-24 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB244 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB244.html |