IA HSB230 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - 11:00AM; House Lounge Commerce.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - 11:00AM; House Lounge Commerce.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for providing for a dramshop liability study.
Title
A study bill for providing for a dramshop liability study.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | 11:00AM; House Lounge Commerce. |
2015-03-26 | House | 11:00AM; House Lounge Commerce. |
2015-03-25 | House | Commerce: Carlson Chair,Lykam, and Rizer. |
2015-03-25 | House | In Commerce |
2015-03-25 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1187 (Related) 2015-03-03 - 10:30AM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge Commerce.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB230 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB230.html |