IA HSB227 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation. Vote Total: 1-0.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation. Vote Total: 1-0.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for advance deposit wagering on gambling games.
Title
A bill for an act providing for advance deposit wagering on gambling games.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation. Vote Total: 1-0. |
2023-03-16 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/21/2023 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2023-03-08 | House | Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, Jacoby and Kaufmann. H.J. 03/08. |
2023-03-08 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 560. |
2023-03-08 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB227 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB227.html |