IA HSB223 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF685
Note: Legislation replaced by SF543
Note: Legislation replaced by SF543
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 685.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 685.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to requirements for licensees under the purview of the dental board relating to orthodontia services.(See HF 685.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to requirements for licensees under the purview of the dental board relating to orthodontia services.(See HF 685.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 685. |
2021-02-23 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 534. |
2021-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2021 11:30AM House Lounge 1. |
2021-02-17 | House | Subcommittee: Jeneary, Bradley and Mascher. H.J. 468. |
2021-02-17 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 467. |
2021-02-17 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1202 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 543.
HF685 (Replaced by) 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1210.
SF543 (Replaced by) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. S.J. 703.
HF685 (Replaced by) 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1210.
SF543 (Replaced by) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. S.J. 703.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB223 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB223.html |