IA HSB211 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF387
Note: Legislation replaced by HF652
Note: Legislation replaced by HF652
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 652.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 652.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the practice of barbering and cosmetology arts and sciences and providing transition provisions.(See HF 652.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the practice of barbering and cosmetology arts and sciences and providing transition provisions.(See HF 652.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 652. |
2023-03-02 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 499. |
2023-03-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2023 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2023-02-27 | House | Subcommittee: Wulf, Dunwell and Nielsen. H.J. 436. |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 434. |
2023-02-27 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1108 (Related) 2023-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 387.
SF387 (Replaced by) 2023-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 865.
HF652 (Replaced by) 2023-05-26 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.
SF387 (Replaced by) 2023-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 865.
HF652 (Replaced by) 2023-05-26 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB211 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB211.html |