IA HSB21 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF142

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 142.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the amount the commission of veterans affairs may use from certain designated sources for the benefit of veterans and making an appropriation.(See HF 142.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the amount the commission of veterans affairs may use from certain designated sources for the benefit of veterans and making an appropriation.(See HF 142.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-26HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 142.
2023-01-25HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 191.
2023-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
2023-01-17HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2023 3:00PM House Lounge.
2023-01-12HouseSubcommittee: Graber, Golding and Turek. H.J. 97.
2023-01-12HouseIntroduced, referred to Veterans Affairs. H.J. 93.
2023-01-12HouseBy COMMITTEE ON VETERANS AFFAIRS

Same As/Similar To

HF142 (Replaced by) 2023-02-14 - Subcommittee: Lofgren, McClintock, and Weiner. S.J. 324.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback