IA HSB21 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF173
Note: Legislation replaced by HF291
Note: Legislation replaced by HF291
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 291.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 291.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to trusts, including requirements for certifications of trust and the general order of abatement.(See HF 291.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to trusts, including requirements for certifications of trust and the general order of abatement.(See HF 291.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 291. |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 226. |
2021-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/20/2021 12:00PM RM 19. |
2021-01-12 | House | Subcommittee: Jacobsen, Lohse and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 72. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 69. |
2021-01-12 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1012 (Related) 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 173.
SF173 (Replaced by) 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 554.
HF291 (Replaced by) 2021-02-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 437.
SF173 (Replaced by) 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 554.
HF291 (Replaced by) 2021-02-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 437.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB21 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB21.html |