IA HSB209 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF385
Note: Legislation replaced by HF699
Note: Legislation replaced by HF699
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 699.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 699.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to nonsubstantive Code corrections, and including retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 699.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to nonsubstantive Code corrections, and including retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 699.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 699. |
2021-02-24 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 551. |
2021-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2021 8:00AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2021-02-15 | House | Subcommittee: Salmon, Bohannan and Westrich. H.J. 395. |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 393. |
2021-02-15 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1189 (Related) 2021-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 385.
SF385 (Replaced by) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 818.
HF699 (Replaced by) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.
SF385 (Replaced by) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 818.
HF699 (Replaced by) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB209 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB209.html |