IA HSB203 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF492
Note: Legislation replaced by HF754
Note: Legislation replaced by HF754
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 754.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 754.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to unemployment insurance and including applicability provisions.(See HF 754.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to unemployment insurance and including applicability provisions.(See HF 754.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 754. |
2021-02-23 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 534. |
2021-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2021 2:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2021-02-11 | House | Subcommittee: Deyoe, Running-Marquardt and Worthan. H.J. 384. |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduced, referred to Labor. H.J. 383. |
2021-02-11 | House | By COMMITTEE ON LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1172 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 492.
SF492 (Replaced by) 2021-06-22 - Referred to Labor and Business Relations. S.J. 1148.
HF754 (Replaced by) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Labor. H.J. 965.
SF492 (Replaced by) 2021-06-22 - Referred to Labor and Business Relations. S.J. 1148.
HF754 (Replaced by) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Labor. H.J. 965.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB203 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB203.html |