IA HSB20 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - NOBA: House Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - NOBA: House Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act eliminating filing fees for requests for independent review of certain determinations under long-term care insurance policies.
Title
A bill for an act eliminating filing fees for requests for independent review of certain determinations under long-term care insurance policies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | NOBA: House Sub |
2017-04-13 | House | NOBA: House Sub |
2017-04-11 | House | NOBA: Joint Subcommittee |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 178. |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2017 4:00PM House Lounge |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee: Pettengill, Forbes and Landon. H.J. 102. |
2017-01-19 | House | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1041 (Related) 2017-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF216 (Replaced by) 2017-04-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 960.
SF233 (Replaced by) 2018-01-17 - Subcommittee reassigned: Breitbach, Bolkcom, and Edler. S.J. 119.
SF492 (Replaced by) 2017-04-11 - Withdrawn. S.J. 964.
HF626 (Replaced by) 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1143.
HF216 (Replaced by) 2017-04-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 960.
SF233 (Replaced by) 2018-01-17 - Subcommittee reassigned: Breitbach, Bolkcom, and Edler. S.J. 119.
SF492 (Replaced by) 2017-04-11 - Withdrawn. S.J. 964.
HF626 (Replaced by) 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1143.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB20 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB20.html |