IA HSB199 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2023 9:00AM RM 304.1 (Cancelled).
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2023 9:00AM RM 304.1 (Cancelled).
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to penalties for the manufacture, delivery, or possession of certain amounts of controlled substances involving cocaine or cocaine base.
Title
A bill for an act relating to penalties for the manufacture, delivery, or possession of certain amounts of controlled substances involving cocaine or cocaine base.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2023 9:00AM RM 304.1 (Cancelled). |
2023-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2023 12:45PM RM 304.1 (Cancelled). |
2023-02-22 | House | Subcommittee: Shipley, Olson and Wilz, H. H.J. 413. |
2023-02-22 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 412. |
2023-02-22 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB199 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB199.html |