IA HSB170 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Voted - Natural Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Voted - Natural Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill relating to underground storage tanks, including by establishing an underground storage tank cost share grant program and fund and making an appropriation.
Title
A study bill relating to underground storage tanks, including by establishing an underground storage tank cost share grant program and fund and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | Voted - Natural Resources. |
2015-02-26 | House | 9:00AM; House Lounge Natural Resources. |
2015-02-25 | House | Natural Resources: Klein Chair,Best, and Ourth. |
2015-02-24 | House | In Natural Resources |
2015-02-24 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HF537 (Replaced by) 2015-05-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 989.
SSB1267 (Related) 2015-04-09 - Voted - Ways and Means.
SF489 (Replaced by) 2015-06-02 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1065.
HF652 (Replaced by) 2015-07-02 - Vetoed by Governor. H.J. 1189.
SSB1267 (Related) 2015-04-09 - Voted - Ways and Means.
SF489 (Replaced by) 2015-06-02 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1065.
HF652 (Replaced by) 2015-07-02 - Vetoed by Governor. H.J. 1189.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB170 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB170.html |