IA HSB154 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF553
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 553.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 553.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the use of certain technology, including the legal effect of the use of distributed ledger technology or smart contracts and affirmative defenses associated with the use of cybersecurity programs.(See HF 553.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the use of certain technology, including the legal effect of the use of distributed ledger technology or smart contracts and affirmative defenses associated with the use of cybersecurity programs.(See HF 553.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 553. |
2023-02-28 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 446. |
2023-02-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-02-20 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2023 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2023-02-09 | House | Subcommittee: Kniff McCulla, Moore, T. and Turek. H.J. 294. |
2023-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to Economic Growth and Technology. H.J. 294. |
2023-02-09 | House | By COMMITTEE ON ECONOMIC GROWTH AND TECHNOLOGY |
Same As/Similar To
HF553 (Replaced by) 2023-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1015.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB154 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB154.html |