IA HSB13 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF143
Note: Legislation replaced by SF203
Note: Legislation replaced by SF203
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 143.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 143.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to ransomware and providing penalties.(See HF 143.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to ransomware and providing penalties.(See HF 143.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-26 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 143. |
2023-01-25 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 189. |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-01-17 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2023 3:00PM House Lounge. |
2023-01-12 | House | Subcommittee: Wood, Gaines and Latham. H.J. 96. |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Economic Growth and Technology. H.J. 92. |
2023-01-12 | House | By COMMITTEE ON ECONOMIC GROWTH AND TECHNOLOGY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1072 (Related) 2023-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 203.
HF143 (Replaced by) 2023-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.
SF203 (Replaced by) 2023-04-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 807.
HF143 (Replaced by) 2023-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.
SF203 (Replaced by) 2023-04-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 807.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB13 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB13.html |