IA HSB129 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF209
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-12 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2019 11:30AM House Lounge.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-12 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2019 11:30AM House Lounge.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act to require school districts and accredited nonpublic schools to offer high school students an opportunity to take the United States citizenship and immigration services naturalization civics test, and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act to require school districts and accredited nonpublic schools to offer high school students an opportunity to take the United States citizenship and immigration services naturalization civics test, and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2019 11:30AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-06 | House | Subcommittee: Hanusa, Gaines and Meyer, A.. H.J. 228. |
2019-02-06 | House | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1043 (Related) 2019-02-04 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF209 (Replaced by) 2019-03-19 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/19/2019 4:00PM House Lounge.
SF209 (Replaced by) 2019-03-19 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/19/2019 4:00PM House Lounge.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB129 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB129.html |