IA HSB110 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF308
Note: Legislation replaced by SF262
Note: Legislation replaced by SF262
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 308.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 308.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to eligibility requirements for students under the senior year plus program and including effective date provisions.(See HF 308.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to eligibility requirements for students under the senior year plus program and including effective date provisions.(See HF 308.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 308. |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 257. |
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2021 11:30AM RM 19. |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee: Sorensen, Dolecheck and Mascher. H.J. 176. |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 173. |
2021-01-21 | House | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1077 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 262.
HF308 (Replaced by) 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 646.
SF262 (Replaced by) 2021-02-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 376.
HF308 (Replaced by) 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 646.
SF262 (Replaced by) 2021-02-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 376.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB110 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB110.html |