IA HSB11 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF528
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Passed subcommittee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Passed subcommittee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act abolishing county compensation boards.
Title
A bill for an act abolishing county compensation boards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 493. |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Jones, Gaskill and Landon. H.J. 116. |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2017 11:30AM House Lounge |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee: Jones, Gaskill and Hager. H.J. 94. |
2017-01-18 | House | By COMMITTEE ON LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HF528 (Replaced by) 2017-04-07 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB11 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB11.html |