IA HSB108 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF328
Note: Legislation replaced by HF359

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 359.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the modification of a bridge order issued pursuant to a previous child in need of assistance case.(See HF 359.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the modification of a bridge order issued pursuant to a previous child in need of assistance case.(See HF 359.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-20HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 359.
2023-02-14HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 309.
2023-02-07HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
2023-01-31HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2023 12:00PM House Lounge.
2023-01-30HouseSubcommittee: Nordman, Jones and Scheetz. H.J. 207.
2023-01-30HouseIntroduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 205.
2023-01-30HouseBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

SSB1066 (Related) 2023-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 328.
SF328 (Replaced by) 2023-05-03 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1039.
HF359 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1039.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback