IA HSB103 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-21 - 9:00AM; House Lounge Human Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A study bill relating to licensure of anesthesiologist assistants, providing for fees, and making penalties applicable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A study bill relating to licensure of anesthesiologist assistants, providing for fees, and making penalties applicable.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-21House9:00AM; House Lounge Human Resources.
2015-02-18House11:30AM; House Lounge Human Resources.
2015-02-03HouseHuman Resources: Taylor Chair,Best, and Heddens.
2015-02-03HouseIn Human Resources
2015-02-03HouseDate Recorded

Same As/Similar To

SSB1150 (Related) 2015-02-12 - 11:30AM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge Human Resources.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback