IA HJR6 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 56-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa specifying marriage between one man and one woman as the only legal union that is valid or recognized in the state.
Title
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa specifying marriage between one man and one woman as the only legal union that is valid or recognized in the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-02-07 | Subcommittee, Hatch, Danielson, and Sorenson. S.J. 235. | |
2011-02-02 | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 199. | |
2011-02-02 | Message from House. S.J. 199. | |
2011-02-02 | Immediate message. H.J. 209. | |
2011-02-01 | Passed House, yeas 62, nays 37. H.J. 200. | |
2011-01-24 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 154. | |
2011-01-20 | Subcommittee, Alons, Hagenow, and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 143. | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 139. |