IA HJR10 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1037.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1037.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A joint resolution authorizing the temporary sale of merchandise at a toy benefit for Iowa children on the state capitol complex grounds. (Formerly HSB 160.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A joint resolution authorizing the temporary sale of merchandise at a toy benefit for Iowa children on the state capitol complex grounds. (Formerly HSB 160.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Shall the resolution be adopted? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Shall the joint resolution be adopted and agreed to? (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Shall the joint resolution be adopted and agreed to? (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1037. |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1037. |
2021-04-07 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 896. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 764. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 763. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 605. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/10/2021 11:30AM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee: Reichman, Bisignano, and Goodwin. S.J. 469. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 366. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 366. |
2021-02-16 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 437. |
2021-02-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 545. |
2021-02-17 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 466. |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed House, yeas 92, nays none. H.J. 422. |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 303. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB160 (Related) 2021-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HJR 10.