IA HF871 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1212.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1212.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act making appropriations to the department of cultural affairs, the economic development authority, the Iowa finance authority, the public employment relations board, the department of workforce development, and the state board of regents and certain regents institutions, and providing for properly related matters, and including effective date, contingent effective date, and applicability provisions. Contingent effective date. Applicability date: 06/13/2021.
Title
A bill for an act making appropriations to the department of cultural affairs, the economic development authority, the Iowa finance authority, the public employment relations board, the department of workforce development, and the state board of regents and certain regents institutions, and providing for properly related matters, and including effective date, contingent effective date, and applicability provisions. Contingent effective date. Applicability date: 06/13/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 54 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 54 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Shall the rules be suspended to consider amendment H–1448? (Y: 35 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-05-06 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 54 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Shall amendment H–1461 be adopted? (Y: 35 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-05-06 - House - Shall amendment H–1460 be adopted? (Y: 38 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-05-06 - House - Shall amendment H–1449 be adopted? (Y: 52 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 54 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Shall the rules be suspended to consider amendment H–1448? (Y: 35 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-05-06 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 54 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Shall amendment H–1461 be adopted? (Y: 35 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-05-06 - House - Shall amendment H–1460 be adopted? (Y: 38 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-05-06 - House - Shall amendment H–1449 be adopted? (Y: 52 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1212. |
2021-06-02 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1207. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | NOBA: Final |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1092. |
2021-05-18 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1151. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1206. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1205. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1200. |
2021-05-18 | House | Passed House, yeas 54, nays 36. H.J. 1149. |
2021-05-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1513. H.J. 1148. |
2021-05-18 | House | Senate amendment H-1513 filed. H.J. 1147. |
2021-05-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1142. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1086. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 1149. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 0. S.J. 1085. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Amendment S-3210 out of order. S.J. 1085. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Amendment S-3216 filed, adopted. S.J. 1085. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Substituted for SF 595. S.J. 1084. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3210 filed. S.J. 1082. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Read first time, attached to similar SF 595. S.J. 1047. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1047. |
2021-05-06 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1076. |
2021-05-18 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1174. |
2021-05-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1100. |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed House, yeas 54, nays 36. H.J. 1059. |
2021-05-06 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 1058. |
2021-05-18 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1174. |
2021-05-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1100. |
2021-05-06 | House | Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-1448. H.J. 1057. |
2021-05-06 | House | Point of order raised on H-1448, ruled not germane. H.J. 1057. |
2021-05-06 | House | Amendment H-1448 filed. H.J. 1057. |
2021-05-06 | House | Amendment H-1440 filed, ruled out of order. H.J. 1057. |
2021-05-18 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1174. |
2021-05-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1100. |
2021-05-06 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1077. |
2021-05-06 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1076. |
2021-05-06 | House | Amendment H-1449 adopted. H.J. 1057. |
2021-05-06 | House | Amendment H-1449 filed. H.J. 1056. |
2021-05-18 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1174. |
2021-05-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1100. |
2021-05-06 | House | Amendment H-1461 lost. H.J. 1056. |
2021-05-06 | House | Amendment H-1461 filed. H.J. 1055. |
2021-05-18 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1174. |
2021-05-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1100. |
2021-05-07 | House | NOBA: House Floor |
2021-05-06 | House | Amendment H-1460 lost. H.J. 1055. |
2021-05-06 | House | Amendment H-1460 filed. H.J. 1054. |
2021-04-14 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2021-04-14 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 954. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1259 (Related) 2021-04-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 595.
SF595 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1086.
SF595 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1086.