IA HF807 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - Subcommittee, Shomshor, T. Olson, and Sands. H.J. 305.
Status: Introduced on March 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - Subcommittee, Shomshor, T. Olson, and Sands. H.J. 305.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the individual income tax by providing for reduced tax rates, the elimination of federal deductibility, increasing the credits for elderly and blind individuals, increasing the amount of the earned income tax credit, and adjusting the eligibility for the child and dependent care tax credit and early childhood development tax credit and including a retroactive applicability date provision. (Formerly HSB 284)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the individual income tax by providing for reduced tax rates, the elimination of federal deductibility, increasing the credits for elderly and blind individuals, increasing the amount of the earned income tax credit, and adjusting the eligibility for the child and dependent care tax credit and early childhood development tax credit and including a retroactive applicability date provision. (Formerly HSB 284)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | Subcommittee, Shomshor, T. Olson, and Sands. H.J. 305. | |
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-04-25 | Referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 2127. | |
2009-04-25 | Amendment H-1768 filed. H.J. 2126. | |
2009-04-24 | Amendments H-1722 and H-1723 filed. H.J. 1947. | |
2009-04-21 | Amendment H-1653 filed. H.J. 1612. | |
2009-04-15 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2009-04-14 | Amendments H-1595, H-1600, H-1601 and H-1602 filed. H.J. 1451. | |
2009-04-14 | Amendments H-1583, H-1584, H-1585, H-1586, H-1587, H-1591, H-1592, H-1593 and H-1594 filed. H.J. 1451. | |
2009-04-14 | Amendments H-1568, H-1570 and H-1576 filed. H.J. 1450. | |
2009-04-13 | Amendments H-1542, H-1543, and H-1544 filed. H.J. 1393. | |
2009-04-13 | Amendment H-1534 filed. H.J. 1392. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 1357. | |
2009-04-08 | Amendment H-1484 filed. H.J. 1290. | |
2009-04-07 | Amendment H-1454 filed. H.J. 1252. | |
2009-04-03 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2009-04-01 | Amendments H-1392, H-1393, and H-1394 filed. H.J. 1106. | |
2009-04-01 | Amendments H-1380, H-1381, H-1382, H-1383, H-1384, H-1385, H-1386, H-1388, and H-1391 filed. H.J. 1106. | |
2009-04-01 | Amendments H-1378 and H-1379 filed. H.J. 1105. | |
2009-03-30 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 1071. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=HF&key=0869C&ga=83 |