IA HF781 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - Subcommittee, Mascher, Kaufmann, and Willems. H.J. 305.
Status: Introduced on March 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - Subcommittee, Mascher, Kaufmann, and Willems. H.J. 305.
Summary
A bill for an act to establish a scope of practice review committee relating to the licensing of midwives. (Formerly HSB 229) (See Cmte. Bill HF 2494)
Title
A bill for an act to establish a scope of practice review committee relating to the licensing of midwives. (Formerly HSB 229) (See Cmte. Bill HF 2494)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | Subcommittee, Mascher, Kaufmann, and Willems. H.J. 305. | |
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-04-25 | Referred to State Government. H.J. 2127. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 1357. | |
2009-03-25 | Amendment H-1306 filed. H.J. 1039. | |
2009-03-18 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 854. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=HF&key=0834C&ga=83 |