IA HF777 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1011.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1011.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to permits for vehicles of excessive size and weight, including vehicles transporting raw forest products, and providing for fees. (Formerly HSB 256.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to permits for vehicles of excessive size and weight, including vehicles transporting raw forest products, and providing for fees. (Formerly HSB 256.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 1011. |
2019-04-24 | House | SF 629 substituted. H.J. 999. |
2019-04-18 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 923. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1045 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 184. S.J. 236.
SF184 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 629. S.J. 1010.
HSB256 (Related) 2019-04-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 925.
SF629 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197.
SF184 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 629. S.J. 1010.
HSB256 (Related) 2019-04-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 925.
SF629 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF777 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF777.html |