IA HF724 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 977.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to appropriations for veterans and health and human services and including other related provisions and appropriations including health policy oversight, public assistance program provisions and a public assistance modernization fund, sprinkler systems for home and community-based services waiver recipient residences, a state-funded family medicine obstetrics fellowship program and fund, adoption subsidy program nonrecurring adoption expenses, real estate transactions involving departmental institutions, providing penalties, and including effective date and other applicability date provisions.(Formerly HSB 248.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to appropriations for veterans and health and human services and including other related provisions and appropriations including health policy oversight, public assistance program provisions and a public assistance modernization fund, sprinkler systems for home and community-based services waiver recipient residences, a state-funded family medicine obstetrics fellowship program and fund, adoption subsidy program nonrecurring adoption expenses, real estate transactions involving departmental institutions, providing penalties, and including effective date and other applicability date provisions.(Formerly HSB 248.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-02HouseWithdrawn. H.J. 977.
2023-05-02HouseSF 561 substituted. H.J. 960.
2023-05-02HouseAmendment H-1329 adopted. H.J. 959.
2023-05-02HouseUnanimous consent for immediate consideration. H.J. 957.
2023-05-01HouseNOBA: House Full Approps
2023-05-01HouseAmendment H-1329 filed. H.J. 954.
2023-05-01HouseIntroduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 920.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1213 (Related) 2023-04-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 561.
SF561 (Similar To) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1088.
HSB248 (Related) 2023-05-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 724.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback