IA HF71 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act establishing daylight saving time as the official time in this state throughout the year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act establishing daylight saving time as the official time in this state throughout the year.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2019 9:30AM House Lounge.
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee: Sexton, Anderson and Sorensen. H.J. 151.
2019-01-23HouseIntroduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 134.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback