IA HF707 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Summary
A bill for an act relating to eligible beneficiaries for a line of duty death benefit under the statewide fire and police retirement system and providing an effective date. Effective 4-17-09.
Title
A bill for an act relating to eligible beneficiaries for a line of duty death benefit under the statewide fire and police retirement system and providing an effective date. Effective 4-17-09.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-04-17 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1601. | |
2009-04-15 | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1482. | |
2009-04-15 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1482. | |
2009-04-07 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1197. | |
2009-04-07 | Immediate message. S.J. 996. | |
2009-04-07 | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 994. | |
2009-03-25 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 862. | |
2009-03-19 | Subcommittee, Courtney, Danielson, and Seymour. S.J. 737. | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 701. | |
2009-03-18 | Message from House. S.J. 701. | |
2009-03-18 | Immediate message. H.J. 862. | |
2009-03-18 | Passed House, ayes 95, nays none. H.J. 861. | |
2009-03-12 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 776. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=HF&key=0755C&ga=83 |