IA HF687 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain reporting requirements or actions required of the department of education, school districts, accredited nonpublic schools, and community colleges. Effective 7-01-09.
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain reporting requirements or actions required of the department of education, school districts, accredited nonpublic schools, and community colleges. Effective 7-01-09.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-04-09 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1358. | |
2009-04-07 | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1248. | |
2009-04-07 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1248. | |
2009-04-01 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1102. | |
2009-04-01 | Immediate message. S.J. 920. | |
2009-04-01 | Passed Senate, ayes 31, nays 19. S.J. 919. | |
2009-04-01 | Amendment S-3174 filed, lost. S.J. 918. | |
2009-04-01 | Amendment S-3173 filed, lost. S.J. 917. | |
2009-03-25 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 847. | |
2009-03-25 | Referred to Education. S.J. 847. | |
2009-03-24 | Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 832. | |
2009-03-24 | Message from House. S.J. 832. | |
2009-03-24 | Immediate message. H.J. 1003. | |
2009-03-24 | Passed House, ayes 59, nays 39. H.J. 1000. | |
2009-03-24 | Amendment H-1219B withdrawn. H.J. 999. | |
2009-03-24 | Amendment H-1219A lost. H.J. 999. | |
2009-03-24 | Amendment H-1141 lost. H.J. 998. | |
2009-03-18 | Amendment H-1219 filed. H.J. 889. | |
2009-03-12 | Amendment H-1141 filed. H.J. 794. | |
2009-03-11 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 764. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=HF&key=0733C&ga=83 |