IA HF683 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Subcommittee: Driscoll, Jochum, and Schultz. S.J. 918.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Subcommittee: Driscoll, Jochum, and Schultz. S.J. 918.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the excise tax imposed on the handling of grain, including by providing for transfer of collected revenue to the grain depositors and sellers indemnity fund, providing for the future elimination of the excise tax, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 230.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the excise tax imposed on the handling of grain, including by providing for transfer of collected revenue to the grain depositors and sellers indemnity fund, providing for the future elimination of the excise tax, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 230.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Driscoll, Jochum, and Schultz. S.J. 918. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 844. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 779. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 779. |
2023-04-13 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 860. |
2023-04-13 | House | Passed House, yeas 98, nays 1. H.J. 851. |
2023-04-03 | House | Fiscal note. |
2023-03-23 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 730. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB230 (Related) 2023-03-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 683.