IA HF661 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the issuance of annual statewide licenses for certain establishments offering food for sale, including license fees, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 278, HF 80.) Effective date: 05/11/2023.
Title
A bill for an act providing for the issuance of annual statewide licenses for certain establishments offering food for sale, including license fees, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 278, HF 80.) Effective date: 05/11/2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3201 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Report (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3201 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture Report (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3201 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Report (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3201 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture Report (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042. |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1038. |
2023-05-03 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 983. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1047. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 33, nays 15. S.J. 1045. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Amendment S-3201 lost. S.J. 1044. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Amendment S-3201 filed. S.J. 999. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 962. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/12/2023 1:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Driscoll, and Jochum. S.J. 735. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 729. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 724. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/22/2023 11:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Subcommittee: Green, Alons, and Bisignano. S.J. 646. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Agriculture. S.J. 594. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 594. |
2023-03-15 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 653. |
2023-03-15 | House | Passed House, yeas 77, nays 20. H.J. 648. |
2023-03-15 | House | Amendment H-1094 adopted. H.J. 648. |
2023-03-14 | House | Amendment H-1094 filed. H.J. 622. |
2023-03-07 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 540. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1040 (Related) 2023-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 134.
HF80 (Similar To) 2023-03-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 653.
SF134 (Similar To) 2023-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
HF278 (Similar To) 2023-03-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 653.
HF80 (Similar To) 2023-03-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 653.
SF134 (Similar To) 2023-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
HF278 (Similar To) 2023-03-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 653.