IA HF661 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1188.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1188.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to probate and estate=related laws, including the deduction of administrative expenses on the Iowa fiduciary income tax return, the Iowa inheritance tax, fiduciaries' right to property and information, and the surviving spouse's elective share, and including retroactive and other applicability provisions. Effective 7-1-15, with exception of section 2 effective 7-1-16.
Title
A bill for an act relating to probate and estate=related laws, including the deduction of administrative expenses on the Iowa fiduciary income tax return, the Iowa inheritance tax, fiduciaries' right to property and information, and the surviving spouse's elective share, and including retroactive and other applicability provisions. Effective 7-1-15, with exception of section 2 effective 7-1-16.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1188. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1186. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1186. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1097. |
2015-06-04 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1148. |
2015-06-04 | House | Passed House, ayes 94, nays none. H.J. 1146. |
2015-06-04 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1392. H.J. 1146. |
2015-06-04 | House | Senate amendment H-1392. H.J. 1145. |
2015-06-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1142. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1096. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 1094. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Amendment S-3223 adopted. S.J. 1093. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Amendment S-3223 filed. S.J. 1093. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 1093. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Subcommittee, Bolkcom, Allen, et al. S.J. 1067. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 1051. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1051. |
2015-06-02 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1117. |
2015-06-02 | House | Passed House, ayes 90, nays none. H.J. 1115. |
2015-05-04 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2015-04-29 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 930. |