IA HF653 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-05 - Referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 1122.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-05 - Referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 1122.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to state taxation by modifying the disabled veteran homestead tax credit, property tax exemptions authorized for certain associations, institutions, and societies, the definition of livestock for purposes of the sales and use tax, exempting certain all-terrain vehicles and off-road utility vehicles from the sales and use tax, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 217)
Title
A bill for an act relating to state taxation by modifying the disabled veteran homestead tax credit, property tax exemptions authorized for certain associations, institutions, and societies, the definition of livestock for purposes of the sales and use tax, exempting certain all-terrain vehicles and off-road utility vehicles from the sales and use tax, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 217)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 1122. |
2015-05-10 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read first time and attached to similar SF 507. S.J. 984. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 984. |
2015-05-06 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1025. |
2015-06-03 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1132. |
2015-05-06 | House | Passed House, ayes 97, nays 1. H.J. 1018. |
2015-05-06 | House | Amendment H-1302 adopted. H.J. 1018. |
2015-05-05 | House | Amendment H-1302 filed. H.J. 1014. |
2015-05-04 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2015-04-27 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 920. |